TN SJR0545 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-16 - Ref. to State Government Committee--Civil--Government Operations for review
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-16 - Ref. to State Government Committee--Civil--Government Operations for review
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a library standards task force to study the application of certain constitutional provisions to the present obscenity statute, and study how it relates to the distribution of certain materials by librarians to patrons.
Title
Creates a library standards task force to study the application of certain constitutional provisions to the present obscenity statute, and study how it relates to the distribution of certain materials by librarians to patrons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AS AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | Senate | Ref. to State Government Committee--Civil--Government Operations for review |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Adopted as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0950) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 cal. for 4/15/2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Rec. for adoption w/am, by S. Gov. Ops. Comm., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 3/26/2014 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Gov Ops Comm. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Filed for intro. |