TN SJR0535 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Youth Art Month.
Title
Youth Art Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-31 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/31/2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/27/2014 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 2/18/2014 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Ref. to Education Committee |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 2/6/2014 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Rec. for adoption by S. Comm. ref to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/4/2014 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Gov. Comm. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Filed for intro. |