TN SJR0461 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 8 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 8 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Adjourns 2013 session on April 19, 2013.
Title
Adjourns 2013 session on April 19, 2013.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2013-04-19 | Senate | R/S Concurred, v.v. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2013-04-19 | Senate | R/S Adopted v.v. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SJR0461&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SJR0461.pdf |