TN SB2819 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the newspaper notice of a county's intent to appropriate funds to a nonprofit organization that is not a charitable organization to be published at least 15 days prior to the legislative body voting on the appropriation. - Amends TCA Title 5 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5 and Title 67, relative to county authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2841 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-13 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Government Committee