TN SB2629 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. GW, H&HR Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. GW, H&HR Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires manufacturers, wholesalers, and distributors of prescription drugs and medicines to have their licenses available on the premises and they shall be responsible for displaying the license on request. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 10, Parts 2 and 3.
Title
As introduced, requires manufacturers, wholesalers, and distributors of prescription drugs and medicines to have their licenses available on the premises and they shall be responsible for displaying the license on request. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 10, Parts 2 and 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-22 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. GW, H&HR Comm. | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to S.GW,H&HR Comm. | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-20 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2902 (Crossfiled) 2010-02-02 - Assigned to s/c Professional Occupations of HHR
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2629&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB2629.pdf |