TN SB2622 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes public school students in grades nine through 12 to be excused from school attendance for one school day per school year to allow students to participate in a civic engagement activity. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to school attendance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2818 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-13 - Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee