TN SB2592 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-21 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 37
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-21 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 37
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, requires vacancies on the board of mayor and aldermen to be filled for the remainder of the unexpired term rather than until after a special or regular election. - Amends Chapter 7 of the Private Acts of 1999.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, requires vacancies on the board of mayor and aldermen to be filled for the remainder of the unexpired term rather than until after a special or regular election. - Amends Chapter 7 of the Private Acts of 1999.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-21 | Senate | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 37 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar cal. for 3/20/2014 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | P2C held on desk. Local Bill |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2498 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-21 - Pr. Ch. 37