TN SB2553 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 937
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 937
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows the state board of equalization to correct an error in the computation of a certified tax rate; makes corrected rate applicable to the tax year in which the certified tax rate is calculated if the error is corrected before the tax billing date and in the next tax year if the error is corrected after the tax billing date. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
As enacted, allows the state board of equalization to correct an error in the computation of a certified tax rate; makes corrected rate applicable to the tax year in which the certified tax rate is calculated if the error is corrected before the tax billing date and in the next tax year if the error is corrected after the tax billing date. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | Senate | Pub. Ch. 937 |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Effective date(s) 07/01/2014 |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/14/2014 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/11/2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/5/2014 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/5/2014 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/25/2014 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 2/25/2014 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/18/2014 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2451 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 937