TN SB2548 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a process for members of a county legislative body and members of the public to challenge a vote of a member of the county legislative body if that member, or the member's spouse, is an employee of the county and voted on a matter that would increase the pay or benefits of that member or that member's spouse. - Amends TCA Title 5, Chapter 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5, Chapter 5, relative to county legislative bodies.
Sponsors
Sen. Art Swann [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 0 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2685 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-23 - Signed by Governor.