TN SB2448 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 24 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 24 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the Real Estate Fraud Reduction Act, which requires county registers of deeds and notaries public to verify the identity of a person recording or notarizing a document relating to certain real estate transactions, as applicable, using a government-issued identification card; requires such registers and notaries to document and maintain as a permanent record certain personally identifying information of a person recording or notarizing such a document; specifies penalties for violations by a notary public. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8, Chapter 13; Title 8, Chapter 16 and Title 66.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 8, Chapter 13; Title 8, Chapter 16 and Title 66, relative to real property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-24 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-22 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 2, PNV 0 |
2024-04-22 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0987) |
2024-04-22 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-04-11 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0911) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/9/2024 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/9/2024 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/8/2024 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2215 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-22 - Sponsor(s) Added.