TN SB2421 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts certain motor vehicles from parking fees at airports in this state if the vehicle displays a disabled veteran or military award license plate. - Amends TCA Section 12-10-109 and Title 42.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 12-10-109 and Title 42, relative to parking fee exemptions for military service members and veterans.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2660 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee