TN SB2393 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 800
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 800
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, names new TRICOR office building and warehouse complex in honor of Patricia Weiland. - Amends TCA Section 41-22-406.
Title
As enacted, names new TRICOR office building and warehouse complex in honor of Patricia Weiland. - Amends TCA Section 41-22-406.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-25 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 800 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/9/2014 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/5/2014 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/5/2014 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2341 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 800