TN SB2389 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires each local school board and governing body of a public charter school to provide a free breakfast and lunch to each student enrolled in a school under the board's or body's jurisdiction; requires the state to reimburse each LEA and public charter school for the cost of providing a free breakfast and lunch to each student enrolled in the LEA or public charter school after all available federal funds have been applied. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6 and Title 49, Chapter 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6 and Title 49, Chapter 1, relative to school meals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2498 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-06 - Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee