TN SB2380 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 934
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 934
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the commissioner of human services, in consultation with various governmental and non-governmental entities that serve poor people, to conduct a study of poverty in Tennessee and submit a state anti-poverty plan to the governor and the general assembly by January 15, 2015. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, requires the commissioner of human services, in consultation with various governmental and non-governmental entities that serve poor people, to conduct a study of poverty in Tennessee and submit a state anti-poverty plan to the governor and the general assembly by January 15, 2015. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. H&W Comm. (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. H&W Comm. (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | Senate | Pub. Ch. 934 |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Effective date(s) 05/16/2014 |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Passed H., Ayes 71, Nays 18, PNV 2 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 30, Nays 2 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0864) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 cal. for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/10/2014 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/9/14 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Recalled from S. H&W Comm. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. H&W Comm. Ayes 5, Nays 3 PNV 0 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Govt. Ops. Comm. to 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 3/12/2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Govt. Ops. Comm. to 3/12/2014 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 3/5/2014 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Govt. Ops. Comm. to 3/5/2014 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 2/26/2014 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2266 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 934