TN SB2355 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-07 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 554
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-07 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 554
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes appropriations for fiscal years 2008-2009 and 2009-2010.
Title
As enacted, makes appropriations for fiscal years 2008-2009 and 2009-2010.
Sponsors
Sen. James Kyle [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-06-12 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-07 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 554 | |
2009-06-17 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 3 - SA0775) | |
2009-06-17 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - SA0751) | |
2009-06-17 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0746) | |
2009-06-17 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2009-06-16 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/17/2009 | |
2009-06-16 | S. Reset on Cal. for 6/17/2009 | |
2009-06-12 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/16/2009 | |
2009-06-12 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 6, Nays 4 PNV 0 | |
2009-06-12 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 6/12/2009 | |
2009-06-11 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/12/2009 | |
2009-06-11 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/11/2009 | |
2009-06-10 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/10/2009 | |
2009-06-09 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 6/10/2009 | |
2009-06-04 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/09/2009 | |
2009-06-03 | Action def. in S. F,W&M Comm. to next cal. | |
2009-06-03 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/03/2009 | |
2009-06-02 | Action def. in S. F,W&M Comm to 6/3/09 | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/02/2009 | |
2009-04-06 | P2C, ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. | |
2009-04-02 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-03-31 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2392 (Crossfiled) 2009-07-07 - Pub. Ch. 554