TN SB2295 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes a physician assistant student loan repayment grant program to incentivize physician assistants to provide health services in health resource shortage areas. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 63.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49 and Title 63, relative to incentivizing physician assistants to provide health services in underserved areas.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2458 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee