TN SB2177 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-25 - S. Reset on last cal.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-25 - S. Reset on last cal.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes standards for state recognition of Native American Indian tribes. - Amends TCA Title 4.
Title
As introduced, establishes standards for state recognition of Native American Indian tribes. - Amends TCA Title 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-03 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-25 | S. Reset on last cal. | |
2012-04-24 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/25/2012 | |
2012-04-24 | S. Reset on cal. for 4/25/2012 | |
2012-04-20 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 cal. for 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-16 | Ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2012-04-16 | Recalled from S. F,W&M Comm. | |
2012-04-03 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 5, Nays 4 PNV 1 | |
2012-03-28 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/3/2012 | |
2012-03-27 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/3/2012 | |
2012-03-21 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/27/2012 | |
2012-03-20 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/27/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/20/2012 | |
2012-01-12 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2012-01-10 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-06 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2284 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-10 - Action Def. in State & Local Government Committee to summer study