TN SB2041 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1117
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1117
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises emergency financial aid law to consider the economic distress of a local government due to a natural disaster.
Title
As enacted, revises emergency financial aid law to consider the economic distress of a local government due to a natural disaster.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 2 BY McNally (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-01 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 2 BY McNally (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-01 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Pub. Ch. 1117 | |
2010-07-06 | Effective date(s) 06/29/10 | |
2010-06-29 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-06-23 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2010-06-22 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-06-09 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-06-09 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2010-06-08 | Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0 | |
2010-06-08 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA1650) | |
2010-06-08 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1629) | |
2010-06-08 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2010-06-04 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-06-03 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 33, Nays 0 | |
2010-06-03 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA1570) | |
2010-06-03 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA1539) | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (3) cal. for 06/03/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (3) cal. for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-06-01 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2010-05-28 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/01/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Action def. in FW&M Comm to 06/01/10 | |
2010-05-27 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/27/2010 | |
2010-05-26 | Action def. in FW&M Comm to 5/27/10 | |
2010-05-26 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/26/2010 | |
2010-05-25 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/26/2010 | |
2010-05-25 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/25/2010 | |
2009-03-25 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2009-03-19 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 03/25/2009 | |
2009-02-26 | P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm. | |
2009-02-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-25 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1987 (Crossfiled) 2010-07-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1117