TN SB1993 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes a medication aide's authority, pursuant to a nursing delegation, to administer oral medications and topical medications prescribed with a designation authorizing or requiring administration on an as-needed basis; removes prohibition against a medical aide administering medications delivered by aerosol, nebulizers, or metered hand-held inhalers without a spacer. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 7.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 63, Chapter 7, relative to health care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/6/2024 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2289 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-22 - Signed by Governor.