TN SB1804 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Failed in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee / no second
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Failed in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee / no second
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Contraceptive Freedom Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 8; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to contraceptives.
Sponsors
Sen. Charlane Oliver [D] | Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] | Sen. London Lamar [D] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] |
Sen. Heidi Campbell [D] | Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Senate | Failed in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee / no second |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/5/2024 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1943 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-05 - Failed in s/c Population Health Subcommittee of Health Committee