TN SB1790 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires each local school board to establish a school lunch program and a school breakfast program that provide a free breakfast and lunch to each student enrolled in a school under the board's jurisdiction; requires the state to reimburse each LEA for the cost of providing a free breakfast and lunch to each student enrolled in the LEA after all available federal funds have been applied. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to school meals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1844 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-12 - Failed for lack of second in: K-12 Subcommittee