TN SB1783 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases penalty for offense of evading arrest in motor vehicle from Class D to Class C felony if the evading results in death or injury to an innocent bystander or 3rd party. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 16, Part 6.
Title
As introduced, increases penalty for offense of evading arrest in motor vehicle from Class D to Class C felony if the evading results in death or injury to an innocent bystander or 3rd party. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 16, Part 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0709) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/10/2014 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/4/2014 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1511 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-14 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee