TN SB1725 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts honorably discharged and retired veterans of the United States armed forces from firing range and classroom training requirements for handgun carry permits upon presenting a DD-214 form indicating a discharge or retirement date within 20 years of application for the permit. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
As introduced, exempts honorably discharged and retired veterans of the United States armed forces from firing range and classroom training requirements for handgun carry permits upon presenting a DD-214 form indicating a discharge or retirement date within 20 years of application for the permit. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-31 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0860) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/31/2014 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014 |
2014-01-22 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2232 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-26 - Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to summer study