TN SB1724 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, for the purpose of receiving the commissioner of safety's approval for a conventional or Class D school bus in its eighteenth year of service to be operated for additional years, requires the bus to have less than 300,000 miles, instead of less than 200,000 miles; requires a bus that has been approved to operate beyond its eighteenth year to be discontinued once it reaches 300,000 miles, instead of 200,000 miles. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 21.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 21, relative to school transportation.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Lowe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1793 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee