TN SB1709 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 951
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 951
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Brian Byrge Act", which allows certain part-time employees of the state university and community college system to enroll in one course per semester at a community college or state college of applied technology without paying tuition charges or maintenance fees. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7 and Title 49, Chapter 7.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Brian Byrge Act", which allows certain part-time employees of the state university and community college system to enroll in one course per semester at a community college or state college of applied technology without paying tuition charges or maintenance fees. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7 and Title 49, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Rep. Dennis Powers [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | House | Pub. Ch. 951 |
2014-06-03 | House | Effective date(s) 07/01/2014 |
2014-05-19 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2014-05-08 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-05-07 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-05-01 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-24 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-04-16 | House | Passed H., Ayes 82, Nays 0 |
2014-04-16 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA0813) |
2014-04-16 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0812) |
2014-04-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 27, Nays 2, PNV 1 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA0849) |
2014-03-31 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0848) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/31/2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/19/2014 |
2014-01-22 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1452 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 951