TN SB1675 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes the requirement that the notice of delinquent hotel-motel taxpayers be published once a week for two consecutive weeks in the month of January. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 4 and Title 67, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 7, Chapter 4 and Title 67, Chapter 4, relative to the occupancy tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2241 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Government Committee