TN SB1628 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 736
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 736
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes various changes concerning the regulation of non-depository financial institutions. - Amends TCA Title 45, Chapter 1; Title 45, Chapter 13; Title 45, Chapter 15; Title 45, Chapter 17; Title 45, Chapter 18; Title 45, Chapter 5 and Title 56, Chapter 37.
Title
As enacted, makes various changes concerning the regulation of non-depository financial institutions. - Amends TCA Title 45, Chapter 1; Title 45, Chapter 13; Title 45, Chapter 15; Title 45, Chapter 17; Title 45, Chapter 18; Title 45, Chapter 5 and Title 56, Chapter 37.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - S. C&L COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - S. C&L COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | Pub. Ch. 736 |
2014-05-16 | House | Effective date(s) 04/21/2014; 04/15/2015; 10/01/2015; 07/01/2015 |
2014-04-22 | House | Governor returned. |
2014-04-09 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-04-09 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-04-08 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-08 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-04-07 | House | S. concurred in H. am. 1 |
2014-04-03 | House | Placed on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 4/7/2014 |
2014-04-02 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0 |
2014-04-02 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0756) |
2014-04-02 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0606) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 2/24/2014 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 2/24/2014 |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 2/20/2014 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 2/11/2014 |
2014-01-16 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1424 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 736