TN SB1581 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allocates all revenue generated from the sales tax on retail sales of new or used motor vehicles and new or used tires to the state highway fund; earmarks a share of sales tax revenue allocated to the general fund to the department of transportation for administrative expenses. - Amends TCA Title 9; Title 54; Title 55 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 9; Title 54; Title 55 and Title 67, relative to the allocation of sales tax revenue for the highway fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ negative recommendation, as amended |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-12-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1974 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-30 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee