TN SB1485 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - Pub. Ch. 682
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - Pub. Ch. 682
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, expands the categories of missing citizens for whom a media alert is sent; changes name of program from "missing citizen alert program" to "Care Alert program". - Amends TCA Section 38-6-121.
Title
As enacted, expands the categories of missing citizens for whom a media alert is sent; changes name of program from "missing citizen alert program" to "Care Alert program". - Amends TCA Section 38-6-121.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Green [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommend for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommend for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | Pub. Ch. 682 | |
2016-04-08 | Effective date(s) 03/24/2016 | |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2016-03-16 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0687) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 3/14/2016 |
2016-03-07 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-03-07 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0687) |
2016-03-07 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0687) |
2016-03-07 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2016-02-11 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/8/2016 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/3/2016 |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1512 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 682