TN SB1105 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, repeals the Soil Scientist Licensure Act of 2009. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 18, Part 2 and Section 62-36-114.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 62, Chapter 18, Part 2 and Section 62-36-114, relative to the Soil Scientist Licensure Act of 2009.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 2/21/2024 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee to 2/21/2024 |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 1/24/2024 |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 1/17/2024 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Energy, Ag., & Natural Resources Committee to second calendar of 2024 |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/8/2023 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0592 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-21 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration