TN SB1032 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces from 30 to 15 days the length of the grace period that the commissioner of revenue may extend to an entity with a liquor-by-the-drink license for failure to timely file its tax return and pay taxes due. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 57, relative to alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1407 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-01 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Government Committee