TN SB0852 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, designates the Tennessee Valley Railroad Museum in Chattanooga as a premier type tourist resort for purposes of consumption of alcoholic beverages on the premises. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 57-4-102, relative to premier type tourist resorts.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1145 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee