TN SB0756 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of human services to advertise prominently on the home page of the department's website the division of adult protective services' toll-free telephone service that enables citizens within the state to call the division free of charge to report abuse, neglect, or exploitation and to seek relevant assistance from the division in such matters. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 38; Title 39; Title 45; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 38; Title 39; Title 45; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to abuse of elders and vulnerable adults.
Sponsors
Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Richard Briggs [R] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Frank Niceley [R] | Sen. Bill Powers [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommend for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommend for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/24/2024 |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2024 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2023 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1248 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-10 - Transmitted to Governor for his action.