TN SB0318 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 302
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 302
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions of law regarding the scheduling of controlled substances and their analogues and derivatives, including updated identifications of drugs categorized in Schedules I–V. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.
Title
As enacted, revises various provisions of law regarding the scheduling of controlled substances and their analogues and derivatives, including updated identifications of drugs categorized in Schedules I–V. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Pub. Ch. 302 | |
2015-05-06 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2015 | |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2015-04-16 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0055) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/13/2015 |
2015-04-08 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 98, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2015-04-08 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0055) |
2015-04-08 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2015-03-19 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment 1 |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/16/2015 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/10/2015 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/3/2015 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0287 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 302