TN SB0129 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 1, PNV 0
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 1, PNV 0
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes requirement for receipt of certain grants and loans for water and wastewater treatment infrastructure projects that a municipality includes depreciation in its calculation of fees or rates. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9; Title 65; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 9; Title 65; Title 67 and Title 68, relative to utilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2024-04-24 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA1118) |
2024-04-24 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0989) |
2024-04-24 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-04-18 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0905) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA1012) |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/15/2024 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/5/2024 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/14/2023 |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/7/2023 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0526 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-24 - Comp. SB subst.