TN SB0007 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 255
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 255
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires fiscal capacity for BEP purposes of each LEA to be set annually by May 1 before the next school year begins; prohibits any change in any LEA's fiscal capacity after it is set. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 3, Part 3.
Title
As enacted, requires fiscal capacity for BEP purposes of each LEA to be set annually by May 1 before the next school year begins; prohibits any change in any LEA's fiscal capacity after it is set. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 3, Part 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 255 | |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/9/2015 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/18/2015 |
2015-01-17 | Senate | Refer to Senate Education Committee |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0006 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-30 - Pub. Ch. 255