TN SB0003 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 449
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 449
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allocates state sales tax revenue derived from sales of admissions to events of a major league soccer franchise to the municipality in which a sports authority is organized and has secured the franchise. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, allocates state sales tax revenue derived from sales of admissions to events of a major league soccer franchise to the municipality in which a sports authority is organized and has secured the franchise. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 449 | |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/1/2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee with recommendation |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/1/2017 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Refer to Senate Revenue Subcommittee |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0006 (Crossfiled) 2017-06-01 - Pub. Ch. 449