TN HR7016 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-25 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-25 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Billy Arbo, Greater Knoxville Sports Hall of Fame
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor and congratulate Billy Arbo upon his induction into the Greater Knoxville Sports Hall of Fame.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-08-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-25 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-08-25 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2023-08-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-08-24 | House | Adopted, Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2023-08-23 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 8/24/2023 |
2023-08-22 | House | Filed for introduction |