TN HR0149 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Claudia Rehg
Title
A RESOLUTION to commend Claudia Rehg for exemplary service as a legislative intern.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-15 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-04-15 | House | Adopted, Ayes 98, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2024-04-11 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/15/2024 |
2024-04-10 | House | Filed for introduction |