TN HJR1460 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 2 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 2 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
East Port Marina & Resort
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor East Port Marina & Resort and the DeVries family.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-05-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-05-02 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/25/2024 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-04-23 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-04-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-23 | House | Adopted, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-04-22 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-22 | House | Filed for introduction |