TN HJR0839 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Jud.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Jud.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Condemns federal court decision granting a preliminary injunction in the case Tanco et al v Haslam.
Title
Condemns federal court decision granting a preliminary injunction in the case Tanco et al v Haslam.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Carr [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 75 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 70 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 1 BY Hill M (Y: 63 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO SUSPEND THE RULES (Y: 71 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 70 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 1 BY Hill M (Y: 63 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO SUSPEND THE RULES (Y: 71 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | House | Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Jud. |
2014-04-16 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2014-04-16 | House | Adopted as am., Ayes 75, Nays 15 |
2014-04-16 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1290) |
2014-04-16 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 of 3 - HA1301) |
2014-04-16 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 of 2 - HA1300) |
2014-04-16 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 of 1 - HA1299) |
2014-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-14 | House | Ref. to Local Government Committee |
2014-04-02 | House | Placed on cal. Delayed Bill Committee for 4/3/2014 |
2014-03-20 | House | Ref. to Delayed Bill Committee |
2014-03-20 | House | Filed for intro. |