TN HJR0811 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-26 - Taken off notice for cal. in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-26 - Taken off notice for cal. in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Supports efforts at the federal level to designate entities that traffic fentanyl and its analogues as a Foreign Terrorist Organization.
Title
Supports efforts at the federal level to designate entities that traffic fentanyl and its analogues as a Foreign Terrorist Organization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-26 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Judiciary Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 5/26/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Action def. in Judiciary Committee to 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | Intro., ref. to Judiciary |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |