TN HJR0679 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-15 - Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. S&L Gov. Comm.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-15 - Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. S&L Gov. Comm.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Designates February as "Turner Syndrome Awareness Month".
Title
Designates February as "Turner Syndrome Awareness Month".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 3 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 3 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | House | Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. S&L Gov. Comm. |
2014-04-14 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2014-04-14 | House | Adopted, Ayes 98, Nays 0 |
2014-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 3 for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-07 | House | Intro., ref. to State Government Committee |
2014-04-03 | House | Approved by Delayed Bills Comm. |
2014-04-02 | House | Placed on cal. Delayed Bill Committee for 4/3/2014 |
2014-02-10 | House | Ref. to Delayed Bill Committee |
2014-02-10 | House | Filed for intro. |