TN HJR0663 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-20 - Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. E,A&NR Comm.
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-20 - Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. E,A&NR Comm.
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges EPA to respect primacy of Tennessee and other states, and to rely on state regulators to develop performance standards when issuing federal guidelines for regulating carbon dioxide emissions from existing fossil-fueled power plants.
Title
Urges EPA to respect primacy of Tennessee and other states, and to rely on state regulators to develop performance standards when issuing federal guidelines for regulating carbon dioxide emissions from existing fossil-fueled power plants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | House | Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. E,A&NR Comm. |
2014-03-19 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2014-03-17 | House | Adopted as am., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2014-03-17 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0759) |
2014-03-13 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/17/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/13/2014 |
2014-03-04 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-25 | House | Action Def. in Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee to 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 2/25/2014 |
2014-02-18 | House | Action Def. in Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee to 2/25/2014 |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 2/18/2014 |
2014-02-06 | House | Intro., ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Filed for intro. |