TN HJR0645 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-20 - Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. C&L Comm.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-20 - Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. C&L Comm.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Congress to support efforts to bring low-cost loans to military service members.
Title
Urges Congress to support efforts to bring low-cost loans to military service members.
Sponsors
Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) INSURANCE AND BANKING COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) INSURANCE AND BANKING COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | House | Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. C&L Comm. |
2014-03-19 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2014-03-17 | House | Adopted, Ayes 90, Nays 0 |
2014-03-13 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/17/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/13/2014 |
2014-03-11 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/11/2014 |
2014-02-05 | House | Intro., ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2014-02-03 | House | Filed for intro. |