TN HJR0593 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-17 - Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. S&L Gov. Comm.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-17 - Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. S&L Gov. Comm.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a special committee to study the development of a pilot program to assist former law enforcement personnel.
Title
Creates a special committee to study the development of a pilot program to assist former law enforcement personnel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STUDY SUBCOMMITTEE OF FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Subcommit (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-14 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STUDY SUBCOMMITTEE OF FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Subcommit (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-14 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | House | Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. S&L Gov. Comm. |
2014-04-16 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2014-04-16 | House | Adopted as am., Ayes 90, Nays 2 |
2014-04-16 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1308) |
2014-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-14 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-04-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2014 |
2014-04-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2014-04-14 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Study Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means for 4/15/2014 |
2014-03-05 | House | Ref. Study Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/5/2014 |
2014-02-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2014-02-25 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/25/2014 |
2014-02-18 | House | Action Def. in State Government Committee to 2/25/2014 |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/18/2014 |
2014-01-29 | House | Intro., ref. to State Government Committee |
2014-01-28 | House | Filed for intro. |