TN HJR0588 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-16 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-16 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the health insurance coverage of men's wellness and preventive services.
Title
Urges the health insurance coverage of men's wellness and preventive services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) INSURANCE AND BANKING COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) INSURANCE AND BANKING COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Action Def. in S .F,W,&M Comm. to 4/16/14 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. on 4/15/14 |
2014-04-10 | House | Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. |
2014-04-09 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2014-04-09 | House | Adopted as am., Ayes 90, Nays 2, PNV 1 |
2014-04-09 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0946) |
2014-04-07 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-03 | House | Held on desk. |
2014-03-27 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/3/2014 |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/27/2014 |
2014-03-18 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-11 | House | Action Def. in Insurance and Banking Committee to 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/11/2014 |
2014-03-04 | House | Action Def. in Insurance and Banking Committee to 3/11/2014 |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-26 | House | Reassigned to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2014-01-29 | House | Intro., ref. to Health Committee |
2014-01-28 | House | Filed for intro. |