TN HB2883 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows law enforcement officers, whether on-duty or off-duty, retired law enforcement officers, active duty and retired members of the armed forces of the United States, whether in discharge of official duties or not, and enhanced handgun carry permit holders, except in certain circumstances, to possess or carry, whether openly or concealed, with or without the intent to go armed, a handgun in any Pre-K-12 public school building or bus, school campus, grounds, recreation area, athletic field, or any other property owned, operated, or while in use by any public board of education or Pre-K-12 school. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13 and Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13 and Title 49, relative to firearms.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Kip Capley [R] | Rep. Monty Fritts [R] | Rep. Bryan Richey [R] |
Rep. Jody Barrett [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Ed Butler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-05 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee - Education Administration Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2788 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee