TN HB2825 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a county legislative body to elect not to permit persons within the county to lawfully carry a handgun without a handgun carry permit by passage of a resolution; requires a county that has passed such a resolution to provide notice to persons present within the county by posting notice of the resolution in conspicuous public locations throughout the county. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13, relative to the carrying of firearms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1686 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-20 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee