TN HB2695 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-02 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-02 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes an attorney to carry a handgun in a building and room in which judicial proceedings are in progress if the attorney is present in furtherance of the attorney’s representation of a party with business before the court, is an enhanced handgun carry permit holder, and keeps the handgun concealed at all times. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, relative to judicial proceedings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2024-03-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2477 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee